TX SB613 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-29 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to services provided by the Health and Human Services Commission to sexually violent offenders who are incompetent to attend sex offender treatment.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to services provided by the Health and Human Services Commission to sexually violent offenders who are incompetent to attend sex offender treatment.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-21 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1469 (Y: 138 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-04 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-29 Effective on 9/1/17
2017-05-29 Signed by the Governor
2017-05-23 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-23HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-22SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-22SenateReported enrolled
2017-05-21SenateHouse passage reported
2017-05-21HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-21HouseRecord vote
2017-05-21HousePassed
2017-05-21HouseRead 3rd time
2017-05-20HousePassed to 3rd reading
2017-05-20HouseRead 2nd time
2017-05-20HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2017-05-18HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-05-12HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-05-11HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-05-11HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-05-10HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2017-05-10HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-05-09HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-05-09HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-05-05HouseReferred to Human Services
2017-05-05HouseRead first time
2017-04-05HouseReceived from the Senate
2017-04-04SenateReported engrossed
2017-04-04SenateRecord vote
2017-04-04SenatePassed
2017-04-04SenateRead 3rd time
2017-04-04SenateRecord vote
2017-04-04SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-04-04SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-04-04SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2017-04-04SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-04-04SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-04-03SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-03-23SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-03-23SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2017-03-23SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2017-03-21SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-21SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-02-13SenateReferred to Criminal Justice
2017-02-13SenateRead first time
2017-02-07SenateCo-author authorized
2017-01-25SenateFiled
2017-01-25SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback