TX SB601 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-18 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the creation and activities of the Texas Produced Water Consortium.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the creation and activities of the Texas Produced Water Consortium.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-29 - Senate - Senate adopts conference committee report (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-05-29 - House - House adopts conference committee report RV#1728 (Y: 132 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - House - Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal RV#1225 (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-30 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-18 Effective immediately
2021-06-18 Signed by the Governor
2021-06-01 Sent to the Governor
2021-05-31SenateSigned in the Senate
2021-05-31HouseSigned in the House
2021-05-31SenateReported enrolled
2021-05-30HouseSenate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
2021-05-29SenateRecord vote
2021-05-29SenateSenate adopts conference committee report
2021-05-29SenateHouse adopts conf. comm. report-reported
2021-05-29HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-29HouseRecord vote RV#1728
2021-05-29HouseHouse adopts conference committee report
2021-05-28HouseConf. Comm. Report distributed
2021-05-27SenateConference committee report filed
2021-05-27SenateHouse appoints conferees-reported
2021-05-27SenateHouse grants request for conf comm-reported
2021-05-27HouseHouse appoints conferees
2021-05-27HouseHouse grants request for conference committee
2021-05-25HouseSenate appoints conferees-reported
2021-05-25HouseSenate requests conference committee-reported
2021-05-25HouseSenate refuses to concur-reported
2021-05-25SenateSenate appoints conferees
2021-05-25SenateSenate requests conference committee
2021-05-25SenateSenate refuses to concur
2021-05-25SenateRead
2021-05-25SenateHouse amendment(s) laid before the Senate
2021-05-18SenateHouse passage as amended reported
2021-05-18HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-18HouseRecord vote RV#1225
2021-05-18HousePassed as amended
2021-05-18HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-18HouseAmended 1-Burrows
2021-05-18HouseRead 3rd time
2021-05-17HousePassed to 3rd reading
2021-05-17HouseRead 2nd time
2021-05-17HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-05-14HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-04-27HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-04-27HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-04-26HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-04-22HouseReported favorably as substituted
2021-04-22HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-04-22HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2021-04-20HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-04-20HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-04-20HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-04-20HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-20HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-04-06HouseReferred to Natural Resources
2021-04-06HouseRead first time
2021-03-31HouseReceived from the Senate
2021-03-30SenateReported engrossed
2021-03-30SenateRecord vote
2021-03-30SenatePassed
2021-03-30SenateRead 3rd time
2021-03-30SenateRecord vote
2021-03-30SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-03-30SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-03-30SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2021-03-30SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-03-29SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2021-03-29SenateCo-author authorized
2021-03-25SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-03-25SenateReported favorably as substituted
2021-03-22SenateTestimony taken in committee
2021-03-22SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-22SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-11SenateReferred to Water, Agriculture, & Rural Affairs
2021-03-11SenateRead first time
2021-02-05SenateFiled
2021-02-05SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB3096 (Same As) 2021-03-19 - Referred to Natural Resources

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB601
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00601I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00601S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00601E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00601H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00601F.htm
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/SB00601H31.HTM
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00601I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB00601I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB00601S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00601S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB00601E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB00601H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00601H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB00601F.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00601F.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ03-30-F.PDF#page=5
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB601&RcdVtNo=1225&Ch=H&Dt=05/18/2021
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB601&RcdVtNo=1728&Ch=H&Dt=05/29/2021
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-29-F.PDF#page=118

Bill Comments

feedback