TX SB60 | 2017 | 85th Legislature 1st Special Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on August 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-11 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the repeal of certain riders for the Texas Medical Board and the Texas State Board of Examiners of Psychologists from the General Appropriations Act that are contingent upon the approval of certain Acts continuing those agencies during the 85th Regular Session.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the repeal of certain riders for the Texas Medical Board and the Texas State Board of Examiners of Psychologists from the General Appropriations Act that are contingent upon the approval of certain Acts continuing those agencies during the 85th Regular Session.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-08-11 - House - Read 3rd time RV#109 (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-07-20 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-19 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-18 - Senate - Rules suspended (Y: 20 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-18 - Senate - Posting rule suspended (Y: 20 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-18 - Senate - Posting rule suspended (Y: 20 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-11 Effective immediately
2017-08-11 Signed by the Governor
2017-08-11 Sent to the Governor
2017-08-11HouseSigned in the House
2017-08-11SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-08-11SenateReported enrolled
2017-08-11SenateHouse passage reported
2017-08-11HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-08-11HouseRecord vote
2017-08-11HousePassed
2017-08-11HouseRead 3rd time
2017-08-10HousePassed to 3rd reading
2017-08-10HouseRead 2nd time
2017-08-10HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2017-08-08HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-08-08HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-08-07HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-08-07HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-08-07HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2017-08-07HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-08-01HouseReferred to Appropriations
2017-08-01HouseRead first time
2017-07-20HouseReceived from the Senate
2017-07-20SenateReported engrossed
2017-07-20SenateRecord vote
2017-07-20SenatePassed
2017-07-20SenateRead 3rd time
2017-07-20SenateLaid before the Senate
2017-07-19SenateRecord vote
2017-07-19SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2017-07-19SenateLaid before the Senate
2017-07-19SenateCo-author authorized
2017-07-18SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-07-18SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2017-07-18SenateTestimony taken in committee
2017-07-18SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-07-18SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-07-18SenateRecord vote
2017-07-18SenateRules suspended
2017-07-18SenateRecord vote
2017-07-18SenatePosting rule suspended
2017-07-18SenateRecord vote
2017-07-18SenatePosting rule suspended
2017-07-18SenateReferred to Business & Commerce
2017-07-18SenateRead first time
2017-07-17SenateFiled
2017-07-17SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=851&Bill=SB60
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/851/billtext/html/SB00060I.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/851/billtext/html/SB00060S.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/851/billtext/html/SB00060E.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/851/billtext/html/SB00060H.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/851/billtext/html/SB00060F.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/851/pdf/85S107-18-F.PDF#page=7
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/851/pdf/85S107-18-F.PDF#page=8
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/851/pdf/85S107-19-F.PDF#page=3
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/851/pdf/85S107-20-F.PDF#page=2
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=851&Bill=SB60&RcdVtNo=109&Ch=H&Dt=08/11/2017

Bill Comments

feedback