TX SB594 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-11 - Referred to Environmental Regulation
Pending: House Environmental Regulation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-11 - Referred to Environmental Regulation
Pending: House Environmental Regulation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the provision of solid waste disposal services by certain counties; authorizing a fee.
Title
Relating to the provision of solid waste disposal services by certain counties; authorizing a fee.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-06 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-11 | House | Referred to Environmental Regulation |
2021-05-11 | House | Read first time |
2021-05-06 | House | Received from the Senate |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Passed |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Amended |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA1 Hinojosa |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Referred to Local Government |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Filed |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
City Government
City Government--Utilities
County Government
County Government--Employees/Officers
COUNTY TAX ASSESSOR-COLLECTORS
Environment
Environment--Solid Waste
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue--Local
Property Interests
Property Interests--Real Property
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Assessment & Collection
City Government--Utilities
County Government
County Government--Employees/Officers
COUNTY TAX ASSESSOR-COLLECTORS
Environment
Environment--Solid Waste
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue--Local
Property Interests
Property Interests--Real Property
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Assessment & Collection