TX SB585 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-17 - Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures
Pending: House Licensing & Administrative Procedures Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-17 - Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures
Pending: House Licensing & Administrative Procedures Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the sale of wine and beer on Sundays.
Title
Relating to the sale of wine and beer on Sundays.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-14 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-14 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-14 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-17 | House | Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures |
2021-05-17 | House | Read first time |
2021-05-14 | House | Received from the Senate |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Passed |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Referred to Business & Commerce |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Filed |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB1551 (Similar To) 2021-05-12 - Left pending in committee
HB1551 (Similar To) 2021-05-12 - Left pending in committee
HB1551 (Similar To) 2021-05-12 - Left pending in committee