TX SB581 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-17 - Co-author authorized
Pending: Senate Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-17 - Co-author authorized
Pending: Senate Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the exemption of certain commercial weighing or measuring devices from registration and inspection requirements.
Title
Relating to the exemption of certain commercial weighing or measuring devices from registration and inspection requirements.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-17 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Referred to Agriculture |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Filed |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB2223 (Same As) 2019-05-17 - Effective immediately
Subjects
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=SB581 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/SB00581I.htm |