TX SB580 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-12 - Co-author authorized
Pending: Senate Business & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to modification of certain prescription drug benefits and coverage offered by certain health benefit plans.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to modification of certain prescription drug benefits and coverage offered by certain health benefit plans.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-12SenateCo-author authorized
2019-02-21SenateReferred to Business & Commerce
2019-02-21SenateRead first time
2019-02-01SenateFiled
2019-02-01SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB2099 (Same As) 2019-05-15 - Co-sponsor authorized

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback