TX SB571 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-20 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Business & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-20 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Business & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to consent for the use or possession of personal identifying information under the Identity Theft Enforcement and Protection Act.
Title
Relating to consent for the use or possession of personal identifying information under the Identity Theft Enforcement and Protection Act.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-20 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Referred to Business & Commerce |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Filed |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB3529 (Same As) 2021-05-26 - Effective on 9/1/21