TX SB570 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Vetoed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - Vetoed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the regulation of the retention, storage, transportation, disposal, processing, and reuse of used or scrap tires; providing a civil penalty; creating a criminal offense.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the regulation of the retention, storage, transportation, disposal, processing, and reuse of used or scrap tires; providing a civil penalty; creating a criminal offense.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-25 - Senate - Senate concurs in House amendment(s) (Y: 20 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - House - Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal RV#1602 (Y: 114 N: 30 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - House - Amended RV#1534 (Y: 112 N: 31 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - House - Vote reconsidered RV#1533 (Y: 102 N: 40 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-05-21 - House - Failed to pass to 3rd reading RV#1509 (Y: 67 N: 71 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2017-04-04 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 20 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 20 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - Senate - Record vote (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - Senate - FA1 Rodríguez (Y: 23 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 23 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-15 Vetoed by the Governor
2017-05-27 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-27HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-27SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-26SenateReported enrolled
2017-05-26HouseSenate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
2017-05-25SenateRecord vote
2017-05-25SenateSenate concurs in House amendment(s)
2017-05-25SenateRead
2017-05-25SenateHouse amendment(s) laid before the Senate
2017-05-23SenateHouse passage as amended reported
2017-05-23HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-23HouseRecord vote
2017-05-23HousePassed as amended
2017-05-23HouseStatement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
2017-05-23HouseAmended
2017-05-23HouseRead 3rd time
2017-05-22HouseRecord vote
2017-05-22HousePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2017-05-22HouseAmended
2017-05-22HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-22HouseRecord vote
2017-05-22HouseVote reconsidered
2017-05-21House1 hr. notice-for reconsideration
2017-05-21HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-21HouseRecord vote
2017-05-21HouseFailed to pass to 3rd reading
2017-05-21HouseRead 2nd time
2017-05-21HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2017-05-19HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-05-05HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-05-05HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-05-05HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-05-02HouseReported favorably as substituted
2017-05-02HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-05-02HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-02HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-04-18HouseReferred to Environmental Regulation
2017-04-18HouseRead first time
2017-04-05HouseReceived from the Senate
2017-04-04SenateReported engrossed
2017-04-04SenateRecord vote
2017-04-04SenatePassed
2017-04-04SenateRead 3rd time
2017-04-04SenateRecord vote
2017-04-04SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-04-04SenateCo-author authorized
2017-04-03SenateRecord vote
2017-04-03SenatePassed to engrossment as amended
2017-04-03SenateRecord vote
2017-04-03SenateAmended
2017-04-03SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-04-03SenateRead 2nd time
2017-04-03SenateRecord vote
2017-04-03SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-03-28SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-03-27SenateCo-author authorized
2017-03-23SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-03-23SenateReported favorably as substituted
2017-03-21SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-14SenateLeft pending in committee
2017-03-14SenateTestimony taken in committee
2017-03-14SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-14SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-02-27SenateCo-author authorized
2017-02-21SenateCo-author authorized
2017-02-15SenateCo-author authorized
2017-02-14SenateCo-author authorized
2017-02-08SenateReferred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
2017-02-08SenateRead first time
2017-01-20SenateFiled
2017-01-20SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB570
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB00570I.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB00570S.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB00570E.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB00570H.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB00570F.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/85r/pdf/85RSJ04-03-F.PDF#page=10
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/85r/pdf/85RSJ04-03-F.PDF#page=11
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB570&RcdVtNo=1509&Ch=H&Dt=05/21/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB570&RcdVtNo=1533&Ch=H&Dt=05/22/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB570&RcdVtNo=1534&Ch=H&Dt=05/22/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB570&RcdVtNo=1602&Ch=H&Dt=05/23/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/85r/pdf/85RSJ04-04-F.PDF#page=25
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/85r/pdf/85RSJ05-25-F.PDF#page=220

Bill Comments

feedback