TX SB569 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 22 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-05-24 - Signed in the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the regulation of listed family homes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the regulation of listed family homes.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-22 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1639 (Y: 120 N: 24 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-24SenateSigned in the Senate
2019-05-22SenateReported enrolled
2019-05-22SenateHouse passage reported
2019-05-22HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-22HouseRecord vote RV#1639
2019-05-22HousePassed
2019-05-22HouseRead 3rd time
2019-05-21HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-21HousePassed to 3rd reading
2019-05-21HouseRead 2nd time
2019-05-21HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-05-19HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-05-13HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-05-13HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-05-10HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-05-09HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-05-09HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-04-23HouseReferred to Human Services
2019-04-23HouseRead first time
2019-04-17HouseReceived from the Senate
2019-04-16SenateReported engrossed
2019-04-16SenateRecord vote
2019-04-16SenatePassed
2019-04-16SenateRead 3rd time
2019-04-16SenateRecord vote
2019-04-16SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-04-16SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-04-16SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2019-04-16SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-04-16SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2019-04-15SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-04-08SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-04-08SenateReported favorably as substituted
2019-04-02SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-19SenateLeft pending in committee
2019-03-19SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-19SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-02-21SenateReferred to Health & Human Services
2019-02-21SenateRead first time
2019-02-01SenateFiled
2019-02-01SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB4259 (Similar To) 2019-04-09 - Left pending in committee

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback