TX SB553 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-4)
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-26 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Land & Resource Management Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the acquisition of certain real property in conjunction with the acquisition of real property for a public use through eminent domain procedures.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the acquisition of certain real property in conjunction with the acquisition of real property for a public use through eminent domain procedures.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-25 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-26HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-04-25HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-04-25HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-25HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-28HouseReferred to Land & Resource Management
2019-03-28HouseRead first time
2019-03-26HouseReceived from the Senate
2019-03-25SenateReported engrossed
2019-03-25SenateRecord vote
2019-03-25SenatePassed
2019-03-25SenateRead 3rd time
2019-03-25SenateRecord vote
2019-03-25SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-03-25SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-03-25SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2019-03-25SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2019-03-25SenateCo-author authorized
2019-03-18SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-03-18SenateCo-author authorized
2019-03-13SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-03-13SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2019-03-13SenateReported favorably as substituted
2019-03-11SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-03-11SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-11SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-07SenateMeeting cancelled
2019-03-07SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-02-21SenateReferred to State Affairs
2019-02-21SenateRead first time
2019-01-31SenateFiled
2019-01-31SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB1246 (Same As) 2019-02-26 - Referred to Land & Resource Management

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback