TX SB547 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-29 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-29 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the provision of services and resources to certain individuals by a state supported living center and to the creation of a schedule of support services a state supported living center may provide and procedures for establishing applicable fees for those services.
Title
Relating to the provision of services and resources to certain individuals by a state supported living center and to the creation of a schedule of support services a state supported living center may provide and procedures for establishing applicable fees for those services.
Sponsors
Sen. Lois Kolkhorst [R] | Rep. Stan Lambert [R] | Rep. Richard Raymond [D] | Rep. Phil Stephenson [R] |
Rep. Lynn Stucky [R] | Rep. Ina Minjarez [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-21 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1483 (Y: 128 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-29 | Effective immediately | |
2017-05-29 | Signed by the Governor | |
2017-05-23 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-05-23 | House | Signed in the House |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2017-05-21 | Senate | House passage reported |
2017-05-21 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-21 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-21 | House | Passed |
2017-05-21 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-20 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2017-05-20 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-20 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2017-05-18 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-05-10 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-05-10 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-05-10 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-05-09 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-05-09 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-05-08 | House | Referred to Human Services |
2017-05-08 | House | Read first time |
2017-04-26 | House | Received from the Senate |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Passed |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Health & Human Services |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Filed |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Disabilities, Persons with
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue--State
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Mental Health & Substance Abuse
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue--State
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Mental Health & Substance Abuse