TX SB54 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 9 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-21 - Committee report printed and distributed
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 9 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-21 - Committee report printed and distributed
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to a study and report by the Texas Higher Education Coordinating Board regarding best practices for assisting students with autism spectrum disorder.
Title
Relating to a study and report by the Texas Higher Education Coordinating Board regarding best practices for assisting students with autism spectrum disorder.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-21 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Higher Education |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Read first time |
2020-11-09 | Senate | Filed |
2020-11-09 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
AUTISM & PERVASIVE DEVELOPMENTAL DISORDERS
Disabilities, Persons with
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Institutions & Programs
HIGHER EDUCATION COORDINATING BOARD, TEXAS
Disabilities, Persons with
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Institutions & Programs
HIGHER EDUCATION COORDINATING BOARD, TEXAS