TX SB537 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-20 - Co-author authorized
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-20 - Co-author authorized
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to minimum standards for abortion facilities.
Title
Relating to minimum standards for abortion facilities.
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Deuell [R] | Sen. Donna Campbell [R] | Sen. Charles Schwertner [R] | Sen. Eddie Lucio [D] |
Sen. Jane Nelson [R] | Sen. Kenneth Paxton [R] | Sen. Tommy Williams [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-20 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Referred to Health & Human Services |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Read first time |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Filed |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |