TX SB537 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Effective on 9/1/09
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Effective on 9/1/09
Summary
Relating to the emergency installation and use of a device to intercept wire, oral, or electronic communications.
Title
Relating to the emergency installation and use of a device to intercept wire, oral, or electronic communications.
Sponsors
Sen. John Carona [R] | Rep. Wayne Christian [R] | Rep. Allen Fletcher [R] | Rep. Carol Kent [D] |
Rep. Joseph Moody [D] | Rep. Paula Pierson [D] | Rep. Debbie Riddle [R] | Rep. Allen Vaught [D] |
Rep. Hubert Vo [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-19 | Effective on 9/1/09 | |
2009-06-19 | Signed by the Governor | |
2009-06-03 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-06-03 | Signed in the House | |
2009-06-02 | Signed in the Senate | |
2009-06-01 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-06-01 | House adopts conf. comm. report-reported | |
2009-05-31 | Record vote | |
2009-05-31 | House adopts conference committee report | |
2009-05-31 | Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported | |
2009-05-31 | Record vote | |
2009-05-31 | Senate adopts conference committee report | |
2009-05-30 | Conf. Comm. Report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-30 | Conference committee report filed | |
2009-05-30 | House appoints conferees-reported | |
2009-05-30 | House grants request for conf comm-reported | |
2009-05-30 | House appoints conferees | |
2009-05-30 | House grants request for conference committee | |
2009-05-29 | Senate appoints conferees-reported | |
2009-05-29 | Senate requests conference committee-reported | |
2009-05-29 | Senate refuses to concur-reported | |
2009-05-29 | Senate appoints conferees | |
2009-05-29 | Senate requests conference committee | |
2009-05-29 | Senate refuses to concur | |
2009-05-29 | Read | |
2009-05-29 | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate | |
2009-05-28 | House passage as amended reported | |
2009-05-27 | Record vote | |
2009-05-27 | Passed | |
2009-05-27 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-27 | Passed to 3rd reading as amended | |
2009-05-27 | Amendment withdrawn | |
2009-05-27 | Amended | |
2009-05-27 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-05-27 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | |
2009-05-25 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2009-05-22 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2009-05-22 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-21 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-05-20 | Reported favorably as amended | |
2009-05-20 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2009-05-20 | Amendment(s) considered in committee | |
2009-05-20 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2009-05-13 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-05-13 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2009-05-13 | Meeting cancelled | |
2009-05-13 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-04-29 | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence | |
2009-04-29 | Read first time | |
2009-04-23 | Received from the Senate | |
2009-04-23 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-04-23 | Record vote | |
2009-04-23 | Passed | |
2009-04-23 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-04-23 | Record vote | |
2009-04-23 | Three day rule suspended | |
2009-04-23 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-04-23 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | |
2009-04-23 | Laid before the Senate | |
2009-04-23 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-04-08 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-08 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-04-08 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | |
2009-04-07 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2009-04-07 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-07 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-02-17 | Referred to Criminal Justice | |
2009-02-17 | Read first time | |
2009-01-26 | Filed | |
2009-01-26 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Courts
Courts--Judges
Crimes
Crimes--Miscellaneous
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--Pretrial Procedure
WIRETAPPING
Courts--Judges
Crimes
Crimes--Miscellaneous
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--Pretrial Procedure
WIRETAPPING