TX SB535 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-07 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the carrying of a handgun by a license holder on the premises of certain places of religious worship.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the carrying of a handgun by a license holder on the premises of certain places of religious worship.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-21 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1564 (Y: 86 N: 53 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-01 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-07 Effective on 9/1/19
2019-06-07 Signed by the Governor
2019-05-25 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-25HouseSigned in the House
2019-05-23SenateSigned in the Senate
2019-05-21SenateReported enrolled
2019-05-21SenateHouse passage reported
2019-05-21HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-21HouseRecord vote RV#1564
2019-05-21HousePassed
2019-05-21HouseRead 3rd time
2019-05-20HousePassed to 3rd reading
2019-05-20HouseAmendment withdrawn 1-Burns
2019-05-20HouseVote reconsidered
2019-05-20HousePoint of order withdrawn Rule 8, Section 3
2019-05-20HouseAmended 1-Burns
2019-05-20HouseRead 2nd time
2019-05-20HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-05-17HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-05-16HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-05-16HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-05-16HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-05-14HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-05-14HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-05-02HouseReferred to Criminal Jurisprudence
2019-05-02HouseRead first time
2019-05-01HouseReceived from the Senate
2019-05-01SenateReported engrossed
2019-05-01SenateRecord vote
2019-05-01SenatePassed
2019-05-01SenateRead 3rd time
2019-05-01SenateRecord vote
2019-05-01SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-05-01SenateRecord vote
2019-05-01SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2019-05-01SenateRecord vote
2019-05-01SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2019-05-01SenateCo-author authorized
2019-04-30SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-04-30SenateCo-author authorized
2019-04-29SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-04-29SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2019-04-29SenateReported favorably as substituted
2019-04-25SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-04-25SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-25SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-02-21SenateReferred to State Affairs
2019-02-21SenateRead first time
2019-01-30SenateFiled
2019-01-30SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB1231 (Same As) 2019-05-07 - Committee report sent to Calendars

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback