TX SB532 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-13 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Natural Resources & Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-13 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Natural Resources & Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the licensure and registration of persons engaged in certain activities pertaining to compressed natural gas or liquefied natural gas containers and systems.
Title
Relating to the licensure and registration of persons engaged in certain activities pertaining to compressed natural gas or liquefied natural gas containers and systems.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-13 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Filed |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB2127 (Same As) 2019-05-24 - Effective on 9/1/19
Subjects
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
Oil & Gas
RAILROAD COMMISSION
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
Oil & Gas
RAILROAD COMMISSION
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=SB532 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/SB00532I.htm |