TX SB524 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature


Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-29 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]


Relating to increasing the punishment for the offense of abuse of a corpse.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.


Relating to increasing the punishment for the offense of abuse of a corpse.


Roll Calls

2017-05-22 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1554 (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]


2017-05-29 Effective on 9/1/17
2017-05-29 Signed by the Governor
2017-05-24 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-23HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-23SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-22SenateReported enrolled
2017-05-22SenateHouse passage reported
2017-05-22HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-22HouseRecord vote
2017-05-22HouseRead 3rd time
2017-05-21HousePassed to 3rd reading
2017-05-21HouseRead 2nd time
2017-05-21HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2017-05-19HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-05-17HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-05-17HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-05-17HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-05-15HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2017-05-15HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-05-15HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-15HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-05-05HouseReferred to Criminal Jurisprudence
2017-05-05HouseRead first time
2017-04-26HouseReceived from the Senate
2017-04-25SenateReported engrossed
2017-04-25SenateRecord vote
2017-04-25SenateRead 3rd time
2017-04-25SenateRecord vote
2017-04-25SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-04-25SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-04-25SenatePassed to engrossment as amended
2017-04-25SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-04-25SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-04-25SenateRead 2nd time
2017-04-25SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-04-25SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-04-24SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-04-20SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-04-20SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2017-04-20SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2017-04-18SenateTestimony taken in committee
2017-04-18SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-18SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-02-06SenateReferred to Criminal Justice
2017-02-06SenateRead first time
2017-01-19SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate


Texas State Sources

Bill Comments