TX SB522 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Enrolled on May 19 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-05-21 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the development of an individualized education program for a public school student with a visual impairment.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the development of an individualized education program for a public school student with a visual impairment.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-17 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1449 (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-21 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-21HouseSigned in the House
2019-05-20SenateSigned in the Senate
2019-05-19SenateReported enrolled
2019-05-19SenateHouse passage reported
2019-05-17HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-17HouseRecord vote RV#1449
2019-05-17HousePassed
2019-05-17HouseRead 3rd time
2019-05-17HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-17HousePassed to 3rd reading
2019-05-17HouseRead 2nd time
2019-05-17HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2019-05-14HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2019-05-09HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2019-05-08HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-05-08HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-05-07HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-05-07HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2019-05-07HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-04-30HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-04-30HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-04-30HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-30HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-04-04HouseReferred to Public Education
2019-04-04HouseRead first time
2019-04-03HouseReceived from the Senate
2019-04-03SenateReported engrossed
2019-04-03SenateRecord vote
2019-04-03SenatePassed
2019-04-03SenateRead 3rd time
2019-04-03SenateRecord vote
2019-04-03SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-04-03SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-04-03SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2019-04-03SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2019-04-03SenateCo-author authorized
2019-04-02SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-03-27SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-03-27SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2019-03-27SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2019-03-26SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-19SenateLeft pending in committee
2019-03-19SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-03-19SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-19SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-02-14SenateReferred to Education
2019-02-14SenateRead first time
2019-01-29SenateFiled
2019-01-29SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback