TX SB522 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-21 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-21 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to contested cases conducted under the Administrative Procedure Act.
Title
Relating to contested cases conducted under the Administrative Procedure Act.
Sponsors
Sen. Craig Estes [R] | Rep. Todd Hunter [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-21 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2013-05-19 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2013-05-16 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2013-05-16 | House | Committee report distributed |
2013-05-15 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2013-05-14 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2013-05-14 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2013-05-08 | House | Left pending in committee |
2013-05-08 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2013-05-08 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-05-08 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-05-07 | House | Posting rule suspended |
2013-05-06 | House | Referred to Special Purpose Districts |
2013-05-06 | House | Read first time |
2013-04-26 | House | Received from the Senate |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Passed |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Amended |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Amended |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Referred to State Affairs |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Read first time |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Filed |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
ADMINISTRATIVE HEARINGS, STATE OFFICE OF
Civil Remedies & Liabilities
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
Civil Remedies & Liabilities
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions