TX SB52 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-15 - Left pending in committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-15 - Left pending in committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to exemptions for disabled peace officers from payment of tuition and fees at public institutions of higher education.
Title
Relating to exemptions for disabled peace officers from payment of tuition and fees at public institutions of higher education.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-15 | House | Left pending in committee |
2013-05-15 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2013-05-15 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2013-05-15 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-05-15 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-05-08 | House | Meeting cancelled |
2013-05-08 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-04-10 | House | Referred to Higher Education |
2013-04-10 | House | Read first time |
2013-04-01 | House | Received from the Senate |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Passed |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Higher Education |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Read first time |
2012-11-12 | Senate | Filed |
2012-11-12 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Disabilities, Persons with
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Student Fees
Education--Higher--Tuition
Law Enforcement
PEACE OFFICERS
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Student Fees
Education--Higher--Tuition
Law Enforcement
PEACE OFFICERS