TX SB517 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-08 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the compensation provided to the governing body of certain special districts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the compensation provided to the governing body of certain special districts.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-08SenateNot again placed on intent calendar
2017-05-02SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-04-26SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-04-26SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2017-04-26SenateReported favorably as substituted
2017-04-24SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-19SenateLeft pending in committee
2017-04-19SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-19SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-02-06SenateReferred to Intergovernmental Relations
2017-02-06SenateRead first time
2017-01-18SenateFiled
2017-01-18SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback