TX SB517 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-20 - Placed on General State Calendar
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-20 - Placed on General State Calendar
Summary
Relating to the application of the child support guidelines in a suit affecting the parent-child relationship.
Title
Relating to the application of the child support guidelines in a suit affecting the parent-child relationship.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-20 | Placed on General State Calendar | |
2009-05-18 | Considered in Calendars | |
2009-05-05 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2009-05-04 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-04 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-04-30 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2009-04-30 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2009-03-31 | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence | |
2009-03-31 | Read first time | |
2009-03-19 | Received from the Senate | |
2009-03-19 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-03-19 | Record vote | |
2009-03-19 | Passed | |
2009-03-19 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-03-19 | Record vote | |
2009-03-19 | Three day rule suspended | |
2009-03-19 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-03-19 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | |
2009-03-19 | Laid before the Senate | |
2009-03-19 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-03-09 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-03-09 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-03-09 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | |
2009-03-04 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-04 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-02-17 | Referred to Jurisprudence | |
2009-02-17 | Read first time | |
2009-01-23 | Filed | |
2009-01-23 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB4227 (Same As) 2009-04-22 - Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)