TX SB506 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-09 - Referred to Transportation
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-09 - Referred to Transportation
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the expansion of broadband services to certain areas.
Title
Relating to the expansion of broadband services to certain areas.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-09 | Senate | Referred to Transportation |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Filed |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB1446 (Same As) 2021-03-05 - Referred to State Affairs
Subjects
BROADBAND DEVELOPMENT OFFICE
BROADBAND NETWORKS
COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS
GOVERNOR'S BROADBAND DEVELOPMENT COUNCIL
INTERNET
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions--Newly Proposed
Utilities
Utilities--Telecommunications
BROADBAND NETWORKS
COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS
GOVERNOR'S BROADBAND DEVELOPMENT COUNCIL
INTERNET
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions--Newly Proposed
Utilities
Utilities--Telecommunications
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB506 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00506I.htm |