TX SB506 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-19 - Failed to receive affirmative vote in comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-19 - Failed to receive affirmative vote in comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to certain voting systems.
Title
Relating to certain voting systems.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-12 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-12 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-12 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-19 | House | Failed to receive affirmative vote in comm. |
2017-05-19 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-05-19 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-05-17 | House | Referred to Elections |
2017-05-17 | House | Read first time |
2017-05-15 | House | Received from the Senate |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Passed |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Referred to State Affairs |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Filed |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |