TX SB50 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-16 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to a competitive and integrated employment initiative for certain Medicaid recipients.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to a competitive and integrated employment initiative for certain Medicaid recipients.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-24 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1388 (Y: 110 N: 33 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-26 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-16 Effective on 9/1/21
2021-06-16 Signed by the Governor
2021-05-26 Sent to the Governor
2021-05-26HouseSigned in the House
2021-05-26SenateSigned in the Senate
2021-05-24SenateReported enrolled
2021-05-24SenateHouse passage reported
2021-05-24HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-24HouseRecord vote RV#1388
2021-05-24HousePassed
2021-05-24HouseRead 3rd time
2021-05-23HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-23HousePassed to 3rd reading
2021-05-23HouseRead 2nd time
2021-05-22HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-05-20HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-05-18HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-05-17HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-05-17HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-05-11HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-05-11HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-05-11HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-05-11HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-04-30HouseReferred to Human Services
2021-04-30HouseRead first time
2021-04-27HouseReceived from the Senate
2021-04-26SenateReported engrossed
2021-04-26SenateRecord vote
2021-04-26SenatePassed
2021-04-26SenateRead 3rd time
2021-04-26SenateRecord vote
2021-04-26SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-04-26SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-04-26SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2021-04-26SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-04-22SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2021-04-20SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-04-20SenateReported favorably as substituted
2021-04-15SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-15SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-04-13SenateLeft pending in committee
2021-04-13SenateTestimony taken in committee
2021-04-13SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-13SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-03SenateReferred to Health & Human Services
2021-03-03SenateRead first time
2020-11-09SenateFiled
2020-11-09SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB50
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00050I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00050S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00050E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00050H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00050F.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00050I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB00050I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB00050S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00050S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00050H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00050F.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ04-26-F.PDF#page=9
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB50&RcdVtNo=1388&Ch=H&Dt=05/24/2021

Bill Comments

feedback