TX SB499 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-09 - Referred to State Affairs
Pending: Senate State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-09 - Referred to State Affairs
Pending: Senate State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the enforcement of certain federal laws regulating firearms, firearm accessories, and firearm ammunition within the State of Texas.
Title
Relating to the enforcement of certain federal laws regulating firearms, firearm accessories, and firearm ammunition within the State of Texas.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-09 | Senate | Referred to State Affairs |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Filed |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB919 (Same As) 2021-03-01 - Referred to State Affairs
HB112 (Similar To) 2021-02-25 - Referred to State Affairs
HB112 (Similar To) 2021-02-25 - Referred to State Affairs
Subjects
ATTORNEY GENERAL
City Government
City Government--General
County Government
County Government--General
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Institutions & Programs
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Miscellaneous
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
TEXAS FIREARM PROTECTION ACT
Weapons
City Government
City Government--General
County Government
County Government--General
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Institutions & Programs
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Miscellaneous
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
TEXAS FIREARM PROTECTION ACT
Weapons
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB499 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00499I.htm |