TX SB497 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-09 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-09 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the creation of an office of data analytics in the Department of Family and Protective Services.
Title
Relating to the creation of an office of data analytics in the Department of Family and Protective Services.
Sponsors
Sen. Carlos Uresti [D] | Rep. Eugene Wu [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-21 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1462 (Y: 134 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-09 | Effective on 9/1/17 | |
2017-06-09 | Signed by the Governor | |
2017-05-23 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-05-23 | House | Signed in the House |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2017-05-21 | Senate | House passage reported |
2017-05-21 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-21 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-21 | House | Passed |
2017-05-21 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-20 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2017-05-20 | House | Laid out as postponed business |
2017-05-19 | House | Postponed |
2017-05-19 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-19 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2017-05-17 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-05-16 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-05-15 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-05-15 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-05-12 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-05-12 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-05-11 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-05-11 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-05-08 | House | Referred to Human Services |
2017-05-08 | House | Read first time |
2017-03-23 | House | Received from the Senate |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Passed |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Health & Human Services |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Filed |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
FAMILY & PROTECTIVE SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Labor
Labor--Workforce Development
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Labor
Labor--Workforce Development
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions