TX SB494 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Enrolled on May 17 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-05-17 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to certain procedures applicable to meetings under the open meetings law and the disclosure of public information under the public information law in the event of an emergency, urgent public necessity, or catastrophic event.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to certain procedures applicable to meetings under the open meetings law and the disclosure of public information under the public information law in the event of an emergency, urgent public necessity, or catastrophic event.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-17 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1461 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-17SenateReported enrolled
2019-05-17SenateHouse passage reported
2019-05-17HouseRecord vote RV#1461
2019-05-17HousePassed
2019-05-17HouseRead 3rd time
2019-05-16HousePassed to 3rd reading
2019-05-16HouseRead 2nd time
2019-05-16HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-05-14HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-05-01HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-04-30HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-30HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-25HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-04-25HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-04-25HouseScheduled for formal meeting on . . .
2019-04-23HouseReferred to State Affairs
2019-04-23HouseRead first time
2019-04-18HouseReceived from the Senate
2019-04-17SenateReported engrossed
2019-04-17SenateRecord vote
2019-04-17SenatePassed
2019-04-17SenateRead 3rd time
2019-04-17SenateRecord vote
2019-04-17SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-04-17SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-04-17SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2019-04-17SenateLaid before the Senate
2019-04-17SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2019-04-17SenateCo-author authorized
2019-04-09SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-04-09SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2019-04-09SenateReported favorably as substituted
2019-04-04SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-02SenateLeft pending in committee
2019-04-02SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-04-02SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-02SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-04-02SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-02-14SenateReferred to Business & Commerce
2019-02-14SenateRead first time
2019-01-28SenateFiled
2019-01-28SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB3752 (Same As) 2019-04-26 - Committee report sent to Calendars

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback