TX SB491 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-09 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the statewide preceptorship program in family medicine.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the statewide preceptorship program in family medicine.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-28 - Senate - Senate concurs in House amendment(s) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1744 (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - House - Constitutional three day rule suspended RV#1710 (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - House - RV#1696 (Y: 115 N: 24 NV: 5 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-09 Effective immediately
2017-06-09 Signed by the Governor
2017-05-30 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-29HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-29SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-28SenateReported enrolled
2017-05-28HouseSenate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
2017-05-28SenateRecord vote
2017-05-28SenateSenate concurs in House amendment(s)
2017-05-28SenateRead
2017-05-28SenateHouse amendment(s) laid before the Senate
2017-05-24SenateHouse passage as amended reported
2017-05-24HouseRecord vote
2017-05-24HousePassed
2017-05-24HouseRead 3rd time
2017-05-24HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-24HouseRecord vote
2017-05-24HouseConstitutional three day rule suspended
2017-05-23HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-23HousePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2017-05-23HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-23HouseRecord vote
2017-05-23HouseAmended
2017-05-23HouseRead 2nd time
2017-05-23HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2017-05-21HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-05-19HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-05-18HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-05-18HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-05-17HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2017-05-17HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-05-17HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-05-17HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-05-17HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-17HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-05-16HousePosting rule suspended
2017-05-05HouseReferred to Higher Education
2017-05-05HouseRead first time
2017-04-04HouseReceived from the Senate
2017-04-03SenateReported engrossed
2017-04-03SenateRecord vote
2017-04-03SenatePassed
2017-04-03SenateRead 3rd time
2017-04-03SenateRecord vote
2017-04-03SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-04-03SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-04-03SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2017-04-03SenateLaid before the Senate
2017-04-03SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2017-03-29SenateNot again placed on intent calendar
2017-03-27SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-03-27SenateCo-author authorized
2017-03-22SenateNot again placed on intent calendar
2017-03-20SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-02-22SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-02-22SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2017-02-22SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2017-02-22SenateTestimony taken in committee
2017-02-22SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-02-22SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-02-06SenateReferred to Higher Education
2017-02-06SenateRead first time
2017-01-17SenateFiled
2017-01-17SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB491
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB00491I.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB00491S.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB00491E.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB00491H.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB00491F.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/85r/pdf/85RSJ04-03-F1.PDF#page=3
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB491&RcdVtNo=1696&Ch=H&Dt=05/23/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB491&RcdVtNo=1710&Ch=H&Dt=05/24/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB491&RcdVtNo=1744&Ch=H&Dt=05/24/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/85r/pdf/85RSJ05-28-F.PDF#page=77

Bill Comments

feedback