TX SB49 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-18 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to procedures regarding defendants who are or may be persons with a mental illness or intellectual disability.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to procedures regarding defendants who are or may be persons with a mental illness or intellectual disability.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-30 - House - House adopts conference committee report RV#1741 (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-05-29 - Senate - Senate adopts conference committee report (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1279 (Y: 144 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-18 Effective on 9/1/21
2021-06-18 Signed by the Governor
2021-06-01 Sent to the Governor
2021-05-31SenateSigned in the Senate
2021-05-31HouseSigned in the House
2021-05-31SenateReported enrolled
2021-05-30SenateHouse adopts conf. comm. report-reported
2021-05-30HouseRecord vote RV#1741
2021-05-30HouseHouse adopts conference committee report
2021-05-30HouseSenate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
2021-05-29SenateRecord vote
2021-05-29SenateSenate adopts conference committee report
2021-05-29HouseConf. Comm. Report distributed
2021-05-28SenateConference committee report filed
2021-05-27SenateHouse appoints conferees-reported
2021-05-27SenateHouse grants request for conf comm-reported
2021-05-27HouseHouse appoints conferees
2021-05-27HouseHouse grants request for conference committee
2021-05-25HouseSenate appoints conferees-reported
2021-05-25HouseSenate requests conference committee-reported
2021-05-25HouseSenate refuses to concur-reported
2021-05-25SenateSenate appoints conferees
2021-05-25SenateSenate requests conference committee
2021-05-25SenateSenate refuses to concur
2021-05-25SenateRead
2021-05-25SenateHouse amendment(s) laid before the Senate
2021-05-20SenateHouse passage as amended reported
2021-05-20HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-20HouseRecord vote RV#1279
2021-05-20HousePassed
2021-05-20HouseRead 3rd time
2021-05-19HousePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2021-05-19HouseAmended 1-Murr
2021-05-19HouseRead 2nd time
2021-05-19HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-05-17HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-05-11HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-05-11HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-05-11HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-05-07HouseReported favorably as substituted
2021-05-07HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-05-07HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2021-05-05HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-05-05HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-05-05HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-05-05HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-04-28HouseReferred to Corrections
2021-04-28HouseRead first time
2021-04-20HouseReceived from the Senate
2021-04-19SenateReported engrossed
2021-04-19SenateRecord vote
2021-04-19SenatePassed
2021-04-19SenateRead 3rd time
2021-04-19SenateRecord vote
2021-04-19SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-04-19SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-04-19SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2021-04-19SenateLaid before the Senate
2021-04-19SenateNot again placed on intent calendar
2021-04-19SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2021-04-14SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2021-04-12SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-04-12SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2021-04-12SenateReported favorably as substituted
2021-04-08SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-08SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-03SenateReferred to Criminal Justice
2021-03-03SenateRead first time
2020-11-09SenateFiled
2020-11-09SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB4212 (Similar To) 2021-05-14 - Received from the House
HB4212 (Similar To) 2021-05-14 - Received from the House

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB49
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00049I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00049S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00049E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00049H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00049F.htm
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/SB00049H21.HTM
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00049I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB00049I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB00049S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00049S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB00049E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB00049H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00049H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB00049F.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00049F.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ04-19-F1.PDF#page=2
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB49&RcdVtNo=1279&Ch=H&Dt=05/20/2021
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB49&RcdVtNo=1741&Ch=H&Dt=05/30/2021
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-29-F.PDF#page=121

Bill Comments

feedback