TX SB488 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Vetoed by the Governor
Status: Vetoed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Vetoed by the Governor
Summary
Relating to the operation of a motor vehicle in the vicinity of a vulnerable road user; providing penalties.
Title
Relating to the operation of a motor vehicle in the vicinity of a vulnerable road user; providing penalties.
Sponsors
Sen. John Carona [R] | Sen. Wendy Davis [D] | Sen. Rodney Ellis [D] | Rep. Linda Harper-Brown [R] |
Sen. Kirk Watson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-19 | Vetoed by the Governor | |
2009-06-03 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-06-03 | Signed in the House | |
2009-06-02 | Signed in the Senate | |
2009-05-31 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-05-31 | Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported | |
2009-05-31 | Record vote | |
2009-05-31 | Senate adopts conference committee report | |
2009-05-30 | House adopts conf. comm. report-reported | |
2009-05-30 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-30 | Record vote | |
2009-05-30 | House adopts conference committee report | |
2009-05-29 | Conf. Comm. Report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-29 | Conference committee report filed | |
2009-05-28 | House appoints conferees-reported | |
2009-05-28 | House grants request for conf comm-reported | |
2009-05-28 | House appoints conferees | |
2009-05-28 | House grants request for conference committee | |
2009-05-27 | Senate appoints conferees-reported | |
2009-05-27 | Senate requests conference committee-reported | |
2009-05-27 | Senate refuses to concur-reported | |
2009-05-23 | Senate appoints conferees | |
2009-05-23 | Senate requests conference committee | |
2009-05-23 | Senate refuses to concur | |
2009-05-23 | Read | |
2009-05-23 | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate | |
2009-05-19 | House passage as amended reported | |
2009-05-19 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-19 | Record vote | |
2009-05-19 | Passed | |
2009-05-19 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-19 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-19 | Passed to 3rd reading | |
2009-05-19 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-05-19 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | |
2009-05-15 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2009-05-13 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2009-05-13 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-12 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-05-05 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-05-05 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2009-05-05 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-05-05 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-28 | Referred to Transportation | |
2009-04-28 | Read first time | |
2009-04-22 | Received from the Senate | |
2009-04-21 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-04-21 | Record vote | |
2009-04-21 | Passed | |
2009-04-21 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-04-21 | Record vote | |
2009-04-21 | Three day rule suspended | |
2009-04-21 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-04-21 | Passed to engrossment as amended | |
2009-04-21 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-04-21 | Amended | |
2009-04-21 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2009-04-21 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-04-21 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-04-21 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2009-04-21 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2009-04-16 | Co-author authorized | |
2009-04-14 | Not again placed on intent calendar | |
2009-04-07 | Motion withdrawn | |
2009-04-07 | Motion to suspend regular order of business | |
2009-04-06 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2009-04-01 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-01 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-03-30 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2009-03-30 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-30 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-11 | Meeting cancelled | |
2009-03-11 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-02-17 | Referred to Transportation & Homeland Sec. | |
2009-02-17 | Read first time | |
2009-01-28 | Co-author authorized | |
2009-01-15 | Filed | |
2009-01-15 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB827 (Same As) 2009-05-13 - Placed on General State Calendar