TX SB486 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-20 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Natural Resources & Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-20 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Natural Resources & Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to vehicle eligibility for the light-duty motor vehicle purchase or lease incentive program.
Title
Relating to vehicle eligibility for the light-duty motor vehicle purchase or lease incentive program.
Sponsors
Sen. Kirk Watson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-20 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Filed |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB1649 (Same As) 2019-05-22 - Placed on intent calendar
Subjects
Environment
Environment--Air
MOTORCYCLES
VEHICLE EMISSIONS
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--General
Environment--Air
MOTORCYCLES
VEHICLE EMISSIONS
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--General
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=SB486 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/SB00486I.htm |