TX SB481 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-16 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the transfer of certain public school students to a school district offering in-person instruction.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the transfer of certain public school students to a school district offering in-person instruction.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-23 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1316 (Y: 139 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-16 Effective immediately
2021-06-16 Signed by the Governor
2021-05-24 Sent to the Governor
2021-05-24HouseSigned in the House
2021-05-24SenateSigned in the Senate
2021-05-24SenateReported enrolled
2021-05-24SenateHouse passage reported
2021-05-23HouseRecord vote RV#1316
2021-05-23HousePassed
2021-05-23HouseRead 3rd time
2021-05-20HousePassed to 3rd reading
2021-05-20HouseRead 2nd time
2021-05-20HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-05-17HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-05-14HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-05-13HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-05-13HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-05-03HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-05-03HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2021-04-27HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-04-27HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-04-27HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-27HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-04-15HouseReferred to Public Education
2021-04-15HouseRead first time
2021-04-12HouseReceived from the Senate
2021-04-09SenateReported engrossed
2021-04-09SenateRecord vote
2021-04-09SenatePassed
2021-04-09SenateRead 3rd time
2021-04-09SenateRecord vote
2021-04-09SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-04-09SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-04-09SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2021-04-09SenateLaid before the Senate
2021-04-09SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2021-04-08SenateCo-author authorized
2021-04-01SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-04-01SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2021-04-01SenateReported favorably as substituted
2021-03-31SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-25SenateLeft pending in committee
2021-03-25SenateTestimony taken in committee
2021-03-25SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-25SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-09SenateReferred to Education
2021-03-09SenateRead first time
2021-01-27SenateFiled
2021-01-27SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB481
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00481I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00481S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00481E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00481H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00481F.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00481I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB00481I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB00481S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00481S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB00481E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00481H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00481F.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ04-09-F.PDF#page=3
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB481&RcdVtNo=1316&Ch=H&Dt=05/23/2021

Bill Comments 750

feedback