TX SB476 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Enrolled on May 19 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-05-19 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to requirements for and municipal regulation of dogs in an outdoor dining area of a food service establishment.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to requirements for and municipal regulation of dogs in an outdoor dining area of a food service establishment.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-17 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1449 (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-03-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-19SenateReported enrolled
2019-05-19SenateHouse passage reported
2019-05-17HouseRecord vote RV#1449
2019-05-17HousePassed
2019-05-17HouseRead 3rd time
2019-05-17HousePassed to 3rd reading
2019-05-17HouseRead 2nd time
2019-05-17HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2019-05-14HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2019-04-24HouseCorrected comm. rept. sent to Local & Consent
2019-04-23HouseCorrected comm. report distributed
2019-04-23HouseCorrected com rept filed w/ Comte Coordinator
2019-04-11HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2019-04-11HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-11HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-08HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-04-08HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2019-04-08HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-03-28HouseReferred to Public Health
2019-03-28HouseRead first time
2019-03-20HouseReceived from the Senate
2019-03-19SenateReported engrossed
2019-03-19SenateRecord vote
2019-03-19SenatePassed
2019-03-19SenateRead 3rd time
2019-03-19SenateRecord vote
2019-03-19SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-03-19SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-03-19SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2019-03-19SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-03-19SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2019-03-19SenateCo-author authorized
2019-03-18SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-03-13SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-03-13SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2019-03-13SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2019-03-12SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-05SenateLeft pending in committee
2019-03-05SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-05SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-02-25SenateCo-author authorized
2019-02-20SenateCo-author authorized
2019-02-14SenateReferred to Business & Commerce
2019-02-14SenateRead first time
2019-01-25SenateFiled
2019-01-25SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB1801 (Same As) 2019-04-08 - Companion considered in lieu of in committee

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback