TX SB475 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - House passage as amended reported
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to an advisory body on the security of the electric grid.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to an advisory body on the security of the electric grid.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-15 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1393 (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-15SenateHouse passage as amended reported
2019-05-15HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-15HouseRecord vote RV#1393
2019-05-15HousePassed
2019-05-15HouseRead 3rd time
2019-05-14HousePassed to 3rd reading
2019-05-14HouseRead 2nd time
2019-05-14HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-05-10HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-04-30HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-04-29HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-29HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-18HouseReported favorably as substituted
2019-04-18HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-04-18HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-04-18HouseScheduled for formal meeting on . . .
2019-04-04HouseReferred to State Affairs
2019-04-04HouseRead first time
2019-04-03HouseReceived from the Senate
2019-04-03SenateReported engrossed
2019-04-03SenateRecord vote
2019-04-03SenatePassed
2019-04-03SenateRead 3rd time
2019-04-03SenateRecord vote
2019-04-03SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-04-03SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-04-03SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2019-04-03SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2019-04-02SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-03-27SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-03-27SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2019-03-27SenateReported favorably as substituted
2019-03-21SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-19SenateLeft pending in committee
2019-03-19SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-03-19SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-19SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-02-14SenateReferred to Business & Commerce
2019-02-14SenateRead first time
2019-01-25SenateFiled
2019-01-25SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB2493 (Same As) 2019-03-11 - Referred to State Affairs

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback