TX SB474 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-19 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Property Tax Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the eligibility of land secured by a home equity loan to be designated for agricultural use for ad valorem tax purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the eligibility of land secured by a home equity loan to be designated for agricultural use for ad valorem tax purposes.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-19SenateLeft pending in committee
2019-03-19SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-03-19SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-19SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-02-14SenateReferred to Property Tax
2019-02-14SenateRead first time
2019-01-25SenateFiled
2019-01-25SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB1254 (Same As) 2019-05-07 - Effective on 1/1/20

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback