TX SB473 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-22 - Effective on 9/1/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to defenses and exceptions to the prosecution of the criminal offense of the possession, manufacture, transport, repair, or sale of certain prohibited explosive weapons, firearms, and related items.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to defenses and exceptions to the prosecution of the criminal offense of the possession, manufacture, transport, repair, or sale of certain prohibited explosive weapons, firearms, and related items.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-05-11 - House - SB 473Third Reading House (Y: 124 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 25) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-05-22 Effective on 9/1/15
2015-05-22 Signed by the Governor
2015-05-12 Sent to the Governor
2015-05-12HouseSigned in the House
2015-05-12SenateSigned in the Senate
2015-05-11SenateReported enrolled
2015-05-11SenateHouse passage reported
2015-05-11HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2015-05-11HouseRecord vote
2015-05-11HousePassed
2015-05-11HouseRead 3rd time
2015-05-08HousePassed to 3rd reading
2015-05-08HouseRead 2nd time
2015-05-08HouseLaid out in lieu of companion
2015-05-07HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2015-05-07HouseCommittee report distributed
2015-05-07HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2015-05-04HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2015-05-04HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2015-04-30HouseReferred to Criminal Jurisprudence
2015-04-30HouseRead first time
2015-04-21HouseReceived from the Senate
2015-04-20SenateReported engrossed
2015-04-20SenateRecord vote
2015-04-20SenatePassed
2015-04-20SenateRead 3rd time
2015-04-20SenateRecord vote
2015-04-20SenateThree day rule suspended
2015-04-20SenateVote recorded in Journal
2015-04-20SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2015-04-20SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2015-04-20SenateCo-author authorized
2015-04-16SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2015-04-16SenateCo-author authorized
2015-04-14SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2015-04-14SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2015-04-14SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2015-04-13SenateTestimony taken in committee
2015-04-13SenateConsidered in public hearing
2015-04-13SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2015-02-25SenateCo-author authorized
2015-02-10SenateReferred to State Affairs
2015-02-10SenateRead first time
2015-02-06SenateFiled
2015-02-06SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback