TX SB469 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 18 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-18 - Effective on 9/1/23
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the eligibility of certain political subdivisions to receive certain financial assistance administered by the Texas Water Development Board.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the eligibility of certain political subdivisions to receive certain financial assistance administered by the Texas Water Development Board.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-05-24 - House - Read 3rd time RV#2039 (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2023-04-27 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-27 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-18 Effective on 9/1/23
2023-06-18 Signed by the Governor
2023-05-29 Sent to the Governor
2023-05-29HouseSigned in the House
2023-05-28SenateSigned in the Senate
2023-05-25SenateReported enrolled
2023-05-25SenateHouse passage reported
2023-05-24HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2023-05-24HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2023-05-24HouseRecord vote RV#2039
2023-05-24HousePassed
2023-05-24HouseRead 3rd time
2023-05-24HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2023-05-24HousePassed to 3rd reading
2023-05-24HouseRead 2nd time
2023-05-24HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2023-05-24SenateCo-author authorized
2023-05-23HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2023-05-20HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2023-05-19HouseCommittee report distributed
2023-05-19HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2023-05-17HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2023-05-17HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2023-05-17HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2023-05-16HouseLeft pending in committee
2023-05-16HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2023-05-16HouseConsidered in public hearing
2023-05-16HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2023-05-04HouseReferred to Natural Resources
2023-05-04HouseRead first time
2023-04-27HouseReceived from the Senate
2023-04-27SenateReported engrossed
2023-04-27SenateRecord vote
2023-04-27SenatePassed
2023-04-27SenateRead 3rd time
2023-04-27SenateRecord vote
2023-04-27SenateThree day rule suspended
2023-04-27SenateVote recorded in Journal
2023-04-27SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2023-04-27SenateLaid before the Senate
2023-04-27SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2023-04-18SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2023-04-18SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2023-04-18SenateReported favorably as substituted
2023-04-17SenateVote taken in committee
2023-04-17SenateConsidered in public hearing
2023-04-17SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2023-02-17SenateReferred to Water, Agriculture, & Rural Affairs
2023-02-17SenateRead first time
2023-01-13SenateFiled
2023-01-13SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=88R&Bill=SB469
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/88R/billtext/html/SB00469I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/88R/billtext/html/SB00469S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/88R/billtext/html/SB00469E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/88R/billtext/html/SB00469H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/88R/billtext/html/SB00469F.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/88R/analysis/html/SB00469I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/88R/fiscalnotes/html/SB00469I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/88R/fiscalnotes/html/SB00469S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/88R/analysis/html/SB00469S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/88R/analysis/html/SB00469H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/88R/analysis/html/SB00469F.htm
Roll Callhttps://journals.senate.texas.gov/sjrnl/88r/pdf/88RSJ04-27-F1.PDF#page=2
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=88R&Bill=SB469&RcdVtNo=2039&Ch=H&Dt=05/24/2023

Bill Comments

feedback