TX SB467 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-14 - Failed to receive affirmative vote in comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-14 - Failed to receive affirmative vote in comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the regulatory analysis of rules proposed by the Texas Commission on Environmental Quality.
Title
Relating to the regulatory analysis of rules proposed by the Texas Commission on Environmental Quality.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-14 | House | Failed to receive affirmative vote in comm. |
2013-05-14 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2013-05-14 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-05-08 | House | Referred to Environmental Regulation |
2013-05-08 | House | Read first time |
2013-04-19 | House | Received from the Senate |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Passed |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Amended |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Amended |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Referred to Natural Resources |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Read first time |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Filed |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Environment
Environment--General
ENVIRONMENTAL QUALITY, TEXAS COMMISSION ON
STATE AGENCIES' RULES
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
Environment--General
ENVIRONMENTAL QUALITY, TEXAS COMMISSION ON
STATE AGENCIES' RULES
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions