TX SB465 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 13 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-21 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-21 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to certain criminal conduct involving a catalytic converter; creating a criminal offense; increasing criminal penalties.
Title
Relating to certain criminal conduct involving a catalytic converter; creating a criminal offense; increasing criminal penalties.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-21 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Read first time |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2023-01-13 | Senate | Filed |
2023-01-13 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Crimes
Crimes--Against Property
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
SECONDHAND METAL
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Equipment
Crimes--Against Property
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
SECONDHAND METAL
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Equipment