TX SB462 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to funding under the transportation allotment for transporting meals and instructional materials to students during a declared disaster.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to funding under the transportation allotment for transporting meals and instructional materials to students during a declared disaster.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-29 - Senate - Senate concurs in House amendment(s) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1500 (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-14 Effective on 9/1/21
2021-06-14 Signed by the Governor
2021-06-01 Sent to the Governor
2021-05-31SenateSigned in the Senate
2021-05-31HouseSigned in the House
2021-05-31SenateReported enrolled
2021-05-29HouseSenate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
2021-05-29SenateRecord vote
2021-05-29SenateSenate concurs in House amendment(s)
2021-05-29SenateRead
2021-05-29SenateHouse amendment(s) laid before the Senate
2021-05-27SenateHouse passage as amended reported
2021-05-26HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-26HouseRecord vote RV#1500
2021-05-26HousePassed
2021-05-26HouseRead 3rd time
2021-05-26HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-26HousePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2021-05-26HouseAmended 1-Allen
2021-05-26HouseRead 2nd time
2021-05-26HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2021-05-23HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2021-05-18HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2021-05-17HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-05-17HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-05-11HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-05-11HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2021-05-11HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2021-05-04HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-05-04HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-05-04HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-05-04HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-04-28HouseReferred to Public Education
2021-04-28HouseRead first time
2021-04-22HouseReceived from the Senate
2021-04-21SenateReported engrossed
2021-04-21SenateRecord vote
2021-04-21SenatePassed
2021-04-21SenateRead 3rd time
2021-04-21SenateRecord vote
2021-04-21SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-04-21SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-04-21SenatePassed to engrossment as amended
2021-04-21SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-04-21SenateAmended
2021-04-21SenateAmendment(s) offered FA1 Lucio
2021-04-21SenateRead 2nd time
2021-04-21SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-04-21SenateCo-author authorized
2021-04-20SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2021-04-20SenateCo-author authorized
2021-04-19SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-04-19SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2021-04-19SenateReported favorably as substituted
2021-04-13SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-08SenateLeft pending in committee
2021-04-08SenateTestimony taken in committee
2021-04-08SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-08SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-09SenateReferred to Education
2021-03-09SenateRead first time
2021-01-26SenateFiled
2021-01-26SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB462
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00462I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00462S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00462E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00462H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00462F.htm
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/SB00462S2F1.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/SB00462H21.HTM
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB00462I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00462I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB00462S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00462S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB00462E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00462H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB00462F.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00462F.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ-04-21-F.PDF#page=16
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB462&RcdVtNo=1500&Ch=H&Dt=05/26/2021
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-29-F.PDF#page=78
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ04-21-F.PDF#page=16

Bill Comments 750

feedback