TX SB46 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 9 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-29 - No action taken in committee
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the municipal regulation of housing for homeless individuals provided by a religious organization.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the municipal regulation of housing for homeless individuals provided by a religious organization.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-29SenateNo action taken in committee
2021-03-29SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-25SenateLeft pending in committee
2021-03-25SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-25SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-22SenateNo action taken in committee
2021-03-22SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-15SenateLeft pending in committee
2021-03-15SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-15SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-03SenateReferred to Local Government
2021-03-03SenateRead first time
2020-11-09SenateFiled
2020-11-09SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB2405 (Same As) 2021-05-14 - Referred to Local Government

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback