TX SB454 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-09 - Referred to Juvenile Justice & Family Issues
Pending: House Juvenile Justice & Family Issues Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-09 - Referred to Juvenile Justice & Family Issues
Pending: House Juvenile Justice & Family Issues Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to certain protective orders in a suit for dissolution of marriage or a suit affecting the parent-child relationship, including a proceeding to adjudicate parentage.
Title
Relating to certain protective orders in a suit for dissolution of marriage or a suit affecting the parent-child relationship, including a proceeding to adjudicate parentage.
Sponsors
Sen. Charles Perry [R] | Sen. Bob Hall [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-14 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-09 | House | Referred to Juvenile Justice & Family Issues |
2017-05-09 | House | Read first time |
2017-03-15 | House | Received from the Senate |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Passed |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Referred to State Affairs |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-01-10 | Senate | Filed |
2017-01-10 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
DIVORCE
Family
Family--Family Violence
Family--Marriage Relationship
Family--Parent & Child
PROTECTIVE ORDERS
Family
Family--Family Violence
Family--Marriage Relationship
Family--Parent & Child
PROTECTIVE ORDERS