TX SB452 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-15 - Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-15 - Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the authority of general-law municipalities to impose term limits on the members of their governing bodies.
Title
Relating to the authority of general-law municipalities to impose term limits on the members of their governing bodies.
Sponsors
Sen. Pat Fallon [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-08 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 20 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 20 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 20 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Motion to suspend regular order fails (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 20 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 20 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Motion to suspend regular order fails (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-15 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-05-15 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-04-25 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-25 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-25 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-04-10 | House | Referred to Urban Affairs |
2019-04-10 | House | Read first time |
2019-04-09 | House | Received from the Senate |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Passed |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Motion to suspend regular order fails |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Filed |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
City Government
City Government--Employees/Officers
City Government--General
Elections
Elections--General
TERM LIMITS
City Government--Employees/Officers
City Government--General
Elections
Elections--General
TERM LIMITS