TX SB45 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-14 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-14 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the provision of employment assistance and supported employment to certain Medicaid waiver program participants.
Title
Relating to the provision of employment assistance and supported employment to certain Medicaid waiver program participants.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-17 - House - SB 45Third Reading House (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-14 | Effective immediately | |
2013-06-14 | Signed by the Governor | |
2013-05-25 | Sent to the Governor | |
2013-05-25 | House | Signed in the House |
2013-05-24 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2013-05-20 | Senate | House passage reported |
2013-05-17 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2013-05-17 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2013-05-17 | House | Record vote |
2013-05-17 | House | Passed |
2013-05-17 | House | Read 3rd time |
2013-05-17 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2013-05-17 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2013-05-17 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-05-17 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2013-05-16 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2013-05-07 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2013-05-06 | House | Committee report distributed |
2013-05-06 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2013-05-02 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2013-05-02 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2013-05-02 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2013-04-30 | House | Left pending in committee |
2013-04-30 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2013-04-30 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-04-30 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-04-16 | House | Referred to Human Services |
2013-04-16 | House | Read first time |
2013-04-11 | House | Received from the Senate |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Passed |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Health & Human Services |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Read first time |
2012-11-12 | Senate | Filed |
2012-11-12 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Disabilities, Persons with
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Human Services
Human Services--Medical Assistance
Labor
Labor--General
MEDICAID
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Human Services
Human Services--Medical Assistance
Labor
Labor--General
MEDICAID