TX SB444 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-15 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-15 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to school marshals for private schools.
Title
Relating to school marshals for private schools.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-15 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Education |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-01-09 | Senate | Filed |
2017-01-09 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Other School Personnel
Education--Primary & Secondary--Private
Education--Primary & Secondary--Teachers
Weapons
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Other School Personnel
Education--Primary & Secondary--Private
Education--Primary & Secondary--Teachers
Weapons