TX SB443 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Enrolled on May 17 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-05-17 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the period for which a property owner may receive a residence homestead exemption from ad valorem taxation for property that is rendered uninhabitable or unusable as a result of a disaster.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the period for which a property owner may receive a residence homestead exemption from ad valorem taxation for property that is rendered uninhabitable or unusable as a result of a disaster.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-17 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1475 (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-17SenateReported enrolled
2019-05-17SenateHouse passage reported
2019-05-17HouseRecord vote RV#1475
2019-05-17HousePassed
2019-05-17HouseRead 3rd time
2019-05-16HousePassed to 3rd reading
2019-05-16HouseRead 2nd time
2019-05-16HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-05-14HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-05-08HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-05-07HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-05-07HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-05-02HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-05-02HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-05-01HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-05-01HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-05-01HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-01HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-04-16HouseReferred to Ways & Means
2019-04-16HouseRead first time
2019-04-11HouseReceived from the Senate
2019-04-11SenateReported engrossed
2019-04-11SenateRecord vote
2019-04-11SenatePassed
2019-04-11SenateRead 3rd time
2019-04-11SenateRecord vote
2019-04-11SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-04-11SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-04-11SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2019-04-11SenateLaid before the Senate
2019-04-10SenateNot again placed on intent calendar
2019-04-11SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2019-04-04SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-04-03SenateCo-author authorized
2019-04-01SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-04-01SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2019-04-01SenateReported favorably as substituted
2019-03-26SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-19SenateLeft pending in committee
2019-03-19SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-03-19SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-19SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-02-14SenateReferred to Property Tax
2019-02-14SenateRead first time
2019-01-30SenateCo-author authorized
2019-01-24SenateFiled
2019-01-24SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

SB540 (Same As) 2019-04-01 - Co-author authorized

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback