TX SB442 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on May 15 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-05-17 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to a disclosure regarding flood coverage under a commercial or residential property insurance policy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to a disclosure regarding flood coverage under a commercial or residential property insurance policy.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-15 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1395 (Y: 140 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-17 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-17HouseSigned in the House
2019-05-16SenateSigned in the Senate
2019-05-15SenateReported enrolled
2019-05-15SenateHouse passage reported
2019-05-15HouseRecord vote RV#1395
2019-05-15HousePassed
2019-05-15HouseRead 3rd time
2019-05-14HousePassed to 3rd reading
2019-05-14HouseRead 2nd time
2019-05-14HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-05-10HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-05-06HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-05-06HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-05-06HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-30HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-04-30HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-23HouseReferred to Insurance
2019-04-23HouseRead first time
2019-04-18HouseReceived from the Senate
2019-04-17SenateReported engrossed
2019-04-17SenateRecord vote
2019-04-17SenatePassed
2019-04-17SenateRead 3rd time
2019-04-17SenateRecord vote
2019-04-17SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-04-17SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-04-17SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2019-04-17SenateLaid before the Senate
2019-04-17SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2019-04-17SenateCo-author authorized
2019-04-11SenateCo-author authorized
2019-04-10SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-04-10SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2019-04-10SenateReported favorably as substituted
2019-04-04SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-02SenateLeft pending in committee
2019-04-02SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-04-02SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-02SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-04-02SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-02-14SenateReferred to Business & Commerce
2019-02-14SenateRead first time
2019-01-24SenateFiled
2019-01-24SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB283 (Similar To) 2019-04-24 - Committee report sent to Calendars

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback