TX SB437 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on June 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-07 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on June 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-07 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to prohibited practices by a life insurance company relating to an individual's prescription for or obtainment of an opioid antagonist.
Title
Relating to prohibited practices by a life insurance company relating to an individual's prescription for or obtainment of an opioid antagonist.
Sponsors
Sen. Jane Nelson [R] | Rep. Four Price [R] | Rep. J.D. Sheffield [R] | Rep. Ina Minjarez [D] |
Rep. Toni Rose [D] | Rep. Gary Vandeaver [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-21 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1534 (Y: 129 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-07 | Effective on 9/1/19 | |
2019-06-07 | Signed by the Governor | |
2019-05-25 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-25 | House | Signed in the House |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-21 | Senate | House passage reported |
2019-05-21 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-21 | House | Record vote RV#1534 |
2019-05-21 | House | Passed |
2019-05-21 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-20 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2019-05-20 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-20 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-05-17 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-05-16 | House | Corrected committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-05-16 | House | Corrected comm. report distributed |
2019-05-16 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-05-16 | House | Corrected com rept filed w/ Comte Coordinator |
2019-05-15 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-05-15 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-05-15 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-05-15 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-05-07 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-05-07 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-05-07 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-07 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-05-01 | House | Referred to Insurance |
2019-05-01 | House | Read first time |
2019-04-26 | House | Received from the Senate |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Passed |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Business & Commerce |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Filed |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB1291 (Same As) 2019-02-27 - Referred to Insurance
Subjects
Crimes
Crimes--Drugs
Health
Health--General
Insurance
Insurance--Health & Accident
Insurance--Life & Annuities
MEDICINE & PRESCRIPTION DRUGS
Crimes--Drugs
Health
Health--General
Insurance
Insurance--Health & Accident
Insurance--Life & Annuities
MEDICINE & PRESCRIPTION DRUGS